Hui, Stephen Hon Lam (CPSO#: 64882)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2009