Hui, Tiffany So Wah (CPSO#: 101111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria East Medical Clinic
Regina SK  S4V 3A6
Phone: (306) 789- 467

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIFFANY SO WAH HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015