Huibregtse, Kornelis (CPSO#: 67396)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2000