Hukui, Julie Naomi Marie (CPSO#: 98411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Hukui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hukui ( CPSO# 98411 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE NAOMI MARIE HUKUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUKUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016