Hulme, Jennifer Meghan (CPSO#: 98363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walsh and Hulme Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hulme ( CPSO# 98363 )
Dr. C. Walsh ( CPSO# 99189 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MEGHAN HULME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HULME is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015