Hulme, William Terrence (CPSO#: 54946)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Respiratory Disease

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992