Hulsemann, Susan Jane (CPSO#: 65439)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2884 North Elm Street
Greensboro NC  27455-2596
United States
Phone: (336) 482-2300

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2007