Hum, Annie (CPSO#: 62463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Phone: (905) 471-9355 Ext. 206
Fax: (905) 471-4348
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon D. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ko ( CPSO# 50980 )
Dr. A. Hum ( CPSO# 62463 )

Business Address:
Canadian Centre Integrative Medicine
12 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Phone Number: (905) 471-9355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE HUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991