Hum, Betty Mae Fong (CPSO#: 76474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southeast Toronto Family HealthTeam
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 105 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Betty Hum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hum ( CPSO# 76474 )

Business Address:
Southeast Toronto Family HealthTeam
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 105 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 469-6464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTY MAE FONG HUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003