Hum, Robert Stanley (CPSO#: 75784)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Jan 2001
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005