Hum, Theresa Hsiohwei Wang (CPSO#: 23741)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010