Humar, Abhinav (CPSO#: 59492)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1996