Humar, Atul (CPSO#: 65104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
PMB 11-175
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4241
Fax: (416) 340-4043
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kumar - Humar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kumar ( CPSO# 70223 )
Dr. A. Humar ( CPSO# 65104 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
PMB-11-175 or Room 11-174
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATUL HUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2013