Humeniuk, William Barry (CPSO#: 62466)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999