Humer, Michael Francis (CPSO#: 58509)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2009