Hummel, Jonathan Simon (CPSO#: 59021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2863 Ellesmere Road
The Court
Suite 204
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 284-0488
Fax: (416) 284-9757
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Hummel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hummel ( CPSO# 59021 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 284-0488

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN SIMON HUMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMMEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1987