Humniski, Anne-Marie Paula (CPSO#: 70409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 Lakeshore Rd East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1E5
Canada
Phone: 905-274-4440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Humniski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Humniski ( CPSO# 70409 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
ER Department
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4141

Business Address:
Unit B
125 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1E5
Phone Number: (905) 274-4440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE PAULA HUMNISKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMNISKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998