Humphrey, Diane Barbara (CPSO#: 67855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
20 Hobson Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M6
Phone: (519) 621-7831
Fax: (519) 621-2702
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diane Humphrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Humphrey ( CPSO# 67855 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
20 Hobson Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M6
Phone Number: (519) 621-7831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE BARBARA HUMPHREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMPHREY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996