Humphrey, Robert John (CPSO#: 82446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
333 Athlone Ave
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 539-6622
Fax: (519) 539-7954
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Humphrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Humphrey ( CPSO# 82446 )

Business Address:
333 Athlone Avenue
Suite 106
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 539-6622

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN HUMPHREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMPHREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010