Humphreys, Robin Paul (CPSO#: 21779)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact: The Hospital for Sick Children Health Records Department Service Floor Tel: 416-813-7576 Fax: 416-813-5802
Date Received: 06 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012