Hundal, Harsharan (CPSO#: 68835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harsharan Hundal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All patient records are at facilities where patient was seen.
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2016