Hundt, Hans Stephen (CPSO#: 84533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
276 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C1
Phone: (519) 351-5500
Fax: (519) 351-5580
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

P O Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hans S. Hundt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hundt ( CPSO# 84533 )

Business Address:
276 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C1
Phone Number: (519) 351-5500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANS STEPHEN HUNDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2011 to 14 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011