Hundt, Penelope Kate (CPSO#: 95361)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Appletree Medical Centre 140 The Esplanade Toronto, Ontario M5A 4P5
Date Received: 11 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2012