Hung, Anthony Richard Tam (CPSO#: 79424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queenway West
Trillium Hospital
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487580
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Hung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hung ( CPSO# 79424 )

Business Address:
Trillium Hospital
209 - 100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY RICHARD TAM HUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 01 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009