Hung, Geoffrey Robert (CPSO#: 74895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective
Association
Station T
P O Box 8225
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Fax: (613) 725-1300
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY ROBERT HUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2013