Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hunt, Allan Jeffrey Anthony (CPSO#: 51650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Jamaican Creole

Education:University of the West Indies, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratories
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7388
Fax: (416) 281-7486
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Forensic Services & Coroner's Compl
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
M3M 0B1
Toronto ON  M7A 1Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 314-4040
Fax: (416) 314-4060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hunt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hunt ( CPSO# 51650 )

Business Address:
Centre for Forensic Sciences
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 400-7984

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN JEFFREY ANTHONY HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1985