Hunt, Carolyn Pasifull Iliffe (CPSO#: 70200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: Iliffe, Carolyn Pasifull (used until: 19 Jul 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Children's Centre
600 Townline Road South
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K6
Phone: (905) 728-1673
Fax: (905) 728-2961
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grandview Children's Centre West
570 Westney Road South
Unit #16
Ajax, ON
Ajax ON  L1S 6V5
Canada
Phone: (905) 728-1673
Fax: (905) 728-2961
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Grandview Children's Centre
1615 Dundas St. E. Suite 203
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Canada
Phone: 905-728-1673 Ext. 2317
Fax: 905-728-1673
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Grandview Children's Centre
16200 Old Simcoe Rd.
Port Perry, ON
L9L 1P3
Port Perry ON  L9L 1A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 728-1673
Fax: (905) 728-2961
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN PASIFULL ILIFFE HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2000