Hunter, Alasdair Grant Walker (CPSO#: 26368)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For medical records patient should contact the Genetic Clinic where patient was seen.
Date Received: 08 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Genetics Effective: 29 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Dec 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017