Hunter, Gary Roland William (CPSO#: 88147)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Mar 2008 to 13 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010