Hunter, Glen Alexander (CPSO#: 61120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN ALEXANDER HUNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990