Hunter, Jonathan Joel (CPSO#: 54222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1285-B
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4557
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Joel Hunter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hunter ( CPSO# 54222 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1285-B
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN JOEL HUNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1985