Hunter, Kathryn Laura (CPSO#: 64119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster University Niagara Regional Campus Cairns Family Health and Bioscience Research Complex 500 Glenridge Avenue St Catharines, ON L2S 3A1
Instructions: Requests should be forwarded to the attention of Dr. K Hunter
Date Received: 17 Jul 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Jul 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN LAURA HUNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 25 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992