Hunter-Orange, Jessica Marion (CPSO#: 82420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Skin Disorders Clinic
355 Wellington Street, Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone: (519) 432-1919 Ext. 222
Fax: (519) 432-9529
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Plastic Surgery
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Hunter-Orange Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hunter-Orange ( CPSO# 82420 )

Business Address:
London Skin Disorders Clinic
Suite 233
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 471-5815

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA MARION HUNTER-ORANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER-ORANGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007