Huo, Jeanne Zhen (CPSO#: 95753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2035
32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone: (905) 604-5535
Fax: (905) 604-7669
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeanne Huo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Huo ( CPSO# 95753 )

Business Address:
32 South Unionville Avenue
Suite 2035
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone Number: (905) 604-5535

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEANNE ZHEN HUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014