Huot, David John (CPSO#: 29183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1977

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
355 Montreal Road
Unit 108
Vanier ON  K1L 8H3
Phone: (613) 744-2786
Fax: (613) 744-0711
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN HUOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUOT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 29, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Dr. Huot has completed all components of the SCERP effective September 1, 2017.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)