Huq, Nasimul Sam (CPSO#: 66419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Plastic Surgery Centre
Suite 1
5668 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Z4
Phone: (905) 357-2360
Fax: (905) 357-4714
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Plastic Surgery Centre
5668 Main Street
Niagara Falls, ON
L2G 5Z4
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Z4
Canada
Phone: 905-357-2360
Fax: 905-357-4714
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. S. Huq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Huq ( CPSO# 66419 )

Business Address:
Niagara Plastic Surgery Centre
1 - 5668 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Z4
Phone Number: (905) 357-2360

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASIMUL SAM HUQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUQ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1998