Huq, Nisarul Mikail (CPSO#: 63760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jan 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

2462 Howard
Unit 120
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

72 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

219 Oxford Street West London Ont
London ON  N6H 1S5
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-3771
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

355 Wellington Street London
London ON  N6A 3N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-1919
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Unit 5 130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 250-4449
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

150 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 624-3511
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisar M. Huq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Huq ( CPSO# 63760 )

Business Address:
1368 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1J9

Business Address:
219 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S5
Phone Number: (519) 432-3771

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 23, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nisarul Mikail Huq,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Huq to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Huq will restrict his practice to non-invasive/non-interventional
                  cardiology in an ambulatory clinical setting.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: FSMB
Active Date: November 18, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College by-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:


On November 18, 2015, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that, based on the adverse action taken against Dr. Huq by the Texas Board of Medicine in June, 2014 (accepting the voluntary and permanent surrender of Dr. Huq’s medical license in lieu of further disciplinary proceedings), Dr. Huq had violated the Michigan Public Health Code. The Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee ordered that Dr. Huq restrict his practice in the state of Michigan to non-invasive/non-interventional cardiology in an ambulatory clinical setting until such time as written documentation is submitted verifying that all terms and conditions imposed on Dr. Huq by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in the Undertaking, Acknowledgement and Consent, dated January 23, 2014, have been removed. The Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee also ordered Dr. Huq to pay a fine of $1000. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated February 12, 2016.


Source: FSMB
Active Date: September 16, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College by-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following is a non-Ontario disciplinary finding made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:


On September 16, 2015, the Pennsylvania State Board of Medicine found that Dr. Huq had violated the Pennsylvania Medical Practice Act in that Dr. Huq had disciplinary action taken by the proper licensing authority of another state (namely, Texas, California and Illinois) against his license to practice the profession. The Board of Medicine accepted Dr. Huq’s voluntary surrender of his license, which was considered a disciplinary sanction by the Board. Dr. Huq is not to return to the practice of medicine in Pennsylvania nor represent himself as a Michigan Board licensee. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated November 3, 2015.