Huq, Rokaiya (CPSO#: 80836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QUEENSWAY CARLETON HOSPITAL
REHABILITATION MEDICINE
3045 BASELINE ROAD
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 4500
Fax: (613) 721-4757
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2230 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7H1
Canada
Phone: 6138209328 Ext. 228
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rokaiya Huq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Huq ( CPSO# 80836 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Rehabilitation Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
2330 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7H1
Phone Number: (613) 820-9328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROKAIYA HUQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2006 to 01 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007