Hurdalek, Jiri Theodore (CPSO#: 31015)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:J.E. Purkyne University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016