Hurlbert, Robin John (CPSO#: 56238)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1996