Hurlburt, Lindsay Dawn (CPSO#: 90591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 2674
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY DAWN HURLBURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURLBURT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014