Hurlbut, David John (CPSO#: 55559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology &
Molecular Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6035
Fax: (613) 548-6076
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hurlbut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hurlbut ( CPSO# 55559 )

Business Address:
Dept of Pathology & Molecular Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 27 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN HURLBUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURLBUT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988