Hurley, Bernard Robert (CPSO#: 73658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8174
Fax: (613) 737-8314
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD ROBERT HURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2006