Hurley, Thomas Charles (CPSO#: 69335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke General Hospital Inc.
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: (613) 732-6351
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Base Medical Clinic
Canadain Forces Base Petawawa
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 687-5511 Ext. 3746
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas C. Hurley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hurley ( CPSO# 69335 )

Business Address:
Pembroke General Hospital Inc
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-3675

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS CHARLES HURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1997