Hurst, David Edward (CPSO#: 57317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
415 Scotia Street
Schreiber ON  P0T 2S0
Phone: (807) 824-2934
Fax: (807) 824-2758
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Edward Hurst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hurst ( CPSO# 57317 )

Business Address:
415 Scotia Street
Schreiber ON  P0T 2S0
Phone Number: (807) 824-2934

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Feb 1998
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 30 Apr 1998

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Dec 1997
Summary:

In December 1997, Dr. Hurst pleaded guilty to the charge of professional misconduct, in that he 
engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional as defined in paragraph 1(1)33 of Regulation 856/93.  The Discipline Committee 
accepted his plea, and found Dr. Hurst guilty of professional misconduct.   The Committee 
imposed the following penalty: 
 
1)    that Dr. Hurst was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
      Register. 
 
2)    that Dr. Hurst s certificate of registration shall be suspended for eight weeks, on a date to 
      be fixed by the Registrar, before March 1, 1998.  The suspension shall be removed after 
      eight weeks upon compliance with the following terms and conditions: 
 
      a)    that Dr. Hurst has completed sessions in the management of clinical boundaries 
            and the management of boundary violations with Dr. ____ until Dr. ______ is 
            satisfied that further sessions are not necessary; and 
 
      b)    that Dr. Hurst has instructed Dr. ____ to report, and Dr. ___has reported, to the 
            Registrar.  This report will include Dr. ___ s assessment, the nature of the 
            intervention and his satisfaction with the outcome in terms of D. Hurst s 
            understanding and management of clinical boundaries and boundary violations. 
 
      c)    that Dr. Hurst has started a course of treatment by a certified psychiatrist or a 
            psychologist who is a member of the College of Psychologists of Ontario, 
            acceptable to the Registrar, who is knowledgeable about the facts resulting in the 
            finding of professional misconduct in this order, and who agrees to provide 
            reports acceptable to the Registrar six months and one year after the start of the 
            treatment program; and  
 
      d)    that Dr. Hurst has agreed to continue in the treatment program and follow the 
            advice of the psychiatrist or psychologist, for as long as the psychiatrist or 
            psychologist considers treatment to be advisable. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 01, 1997