Hurst, David William (CPSO#: 18205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 1962

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jan 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1956
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 1957
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Jan 2003

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Jan 2003 Active View Details [+]
            As  from January 29, 2003, Dr. David William Hurst undertakes to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the College) that he will:

            *     restrict  his  practice,  effective  February  1,  2003,  to assisting at
                  surgery  only when another member of the College is the most  responsible
                  physician.