Hurst, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 93775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6866
Fax: (705) 740-6865
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan David Hurst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hurst ( CPSO# 93775 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6866

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2

Business Address:
39 Commerce Road
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015