Hurwitz, Gilbert Allan (CPSO#: 23729)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gilbert Hurwitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michael's Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Instructions: Image Report Records will be available at St. Michael's Hospital.
Date Received: 01 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014