Hurwitz, Joel Simeon (CPSO#: 59285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Room W018
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6188
Fax: (519) 646-6260
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Hurwitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hurwitz ( CPSO# 59285 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care London
Division of Geriatric Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
Room W018
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6188

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 05 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL SIMEON HURWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURWITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2005