Husain, Juhi (CPSO#: 92518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 ROLLING HILLS DRIVE
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

1A CONESTOGA DRIVE
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 476-1756
Fax: (289) 752-4335
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Husain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Husain ( CPSO# 92518 )

Business Address:
William Olser Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
Conestoga Drive 1
Unit A
Bramalea ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (416) 476-1756

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Hematology Effective: 02 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Juhi Husain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
                  Medical Oncology and Haematology.